|
27.05.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.07.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
24 |
|
04.04.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |