|
12.08.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
30.04.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.12.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.05.2006 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1999 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.02.1998 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |