EP0884525 - Integrated display panel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solid State Opto Limited 55 Andrews Circle c/o Global Lighting Technologies Inc. Brecksville, Ohio 44141 / US | [2006/35] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Solid State Opto Limited 55 Andrews Circle c/o Global Lighting Technologies Inc. Brecksville, Ohio 44141 / US | ||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states LUMITEX, INC. 8443 Dow Circle Strongsville, OH 44136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Jeffery R. 14389 Placid Cove Drive Strongsville, Ohio 44136 / US | 02 /
Klesch, Daniel N. 2043 Carabel Avenue Lakewood, Ohio 44107 / US | 03 /
Miller, Mark D. 2250 W Pleasant Valley Road Parma, Ohio 44134 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence, Regent House, Heaton Lane Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | ||
Former [1998/51] | Lawrence, John Gordon, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303885.2 | 18.05.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | US19970871391 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: US 871391 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884525 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884525 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884525 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, H04M1/22 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/006 (EP,US);
G02B6/0036 (EP,US);
G02B6/0083 (EP,US);
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
A61B2090/309 (EP,US);
G02B6/0033 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0043 (EP,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,US);
G02B6/0061 (EP,US);
G02B6/0065 (EP,US);
H01H2219/044 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | F21V8/00, H04M1/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/35] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung einer integrierten Anzeigetafel | [1998/51] | English: | Integrated display panel assembly | [1998/51] | French: | Assemblage d'un panneau d'affichage intégré | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2285518 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-7,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]US3774021 (JOHNSON B) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * |