|
16.09.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.10.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.05.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
48 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1998 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |