|
21.12.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.05.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.12.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2000 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1998 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
24.07.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |