EP0982877 - LEO mobile satellite communication system with access to base station according to position of the mobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICO Services Ltd. Symphony House, High Street Cowley, Cowley Business Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB8 2AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states ICO Services Ltd. Symphony House High Street Cowley Cowley Business Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB8 2AD / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states ICO Services Ltd. 1 Queen Caroline Street London W6 9BN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poisson, Lionel 13 Shirley Road, Chiswick London W4 1DD / GB | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306803.2 | 25.08.1998 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982877 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H04B7/18567 (EP);
H04B7/18545 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/45] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LEO mobiles Satelliten Kommunikationssystem mit Zugriff zur Basisstation entsprechend der Ortsbestimmung des Mobils | [2000/09] | English: | LEO mobile satellite communication system with access to base station according to position of the mobile | [2000/09] | French: | Système de communication mobile par satellite LEO avec accès à une station de base en fonction de la position du mobile | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 03.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.2001 | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0641137 (SIEMENS) [X] 1-17 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 46; claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0856957 (ICO) [A] 10,16 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO9635304 (NOKIA) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-22 *; | [A]WO9507010 (KONINKLIJKE PTT NEDERLAND) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 25 - page 7, line 11 * |