Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985745

EP0985745 - Bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Darolia, Ramgopal
7377 Overland Park Court
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/11]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. Essex House 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date98307244.808.09.1998
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985745
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985745
Date:12.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C28/00
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/47]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Haftbeschichtung für wärmedämmendes Beschichtungssystem[2000/11]
English:Bond coat for a thermal barrier coating system[2000/11]
French:Couche de liaison pour système de revêtement de barrière thermique[2000/11]
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
15.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2006Fee for grant paid
18.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.02.2007  20.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kaiser, Axel
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [2013/12]
Former [2007/17]
Opponent(s)01  01.02.2007  20.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kaiser, Axel
Siemens AG CT IP PG Völkinger Strasse 2
D-40219 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.06.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.12.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.02.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
11.10.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
11.10.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/13]
11.10.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0514/10
02.03.2010Statement of grounds filed
11.10.2013Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
11.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL01.04.2008
[2008/27]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9729219  (INTERTURBINE NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 8, line 14 - line 31 * * page 9, line 12 - line 26 * * page 10, line 1; claims 1-17 *;
 [A]US5759640  (MANNAVA SEETHARAMAIAH [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 1 - line 15; claims 1,8 *;
 [A]US5302465  (MILLER ROBERT A [US], et al);
 [A]EP0471505  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]);
 [A]JPS6144170
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860716), vol. 10, no. 203, Database accession no. (C - 360), [A] * abstract *
ExaminationEP0792948
 US3450512