|
19.02.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.10.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2013 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2013 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.05.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.01.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |