Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3278048B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2002 | B2 | JPH11111385 | 23.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26900897 | 01.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0913891 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | B1 | EP0913891 | 28.06.2000 | A3 | EP0913891 | 06.05.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP26900897 | 01.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1096131C | 11.12.2002 | C | CN1213872 | 14.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26900897 | 01.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69814299T | 29.01.2004 | T2 | DE69814299D1 | 12.06.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP26900897 | 01.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6183275 | 06.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP26900897 | 01.10.1997 |