Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1555239 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | A3 | EP1555239 | 20.07.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP98308460 | 15.10.1998 | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11209090 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0911295 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2005 | B1 | EP0911295 | 20.12.2000 | A3 | EP0911295 | 28.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2247344 | 09.01.2001 | C | CA2247344 | 24.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69830773T | 24.08.2006 | T8 | DE69830773T | 27.04.2006 | T2 | DE69830773D1 | 11.08.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI982202 | 25.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5927932 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US95669597 | 24.10.1997 | Type | Divisional application | EP1555239 |