|
18.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
14.02.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.02.2011 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.11.2010 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.01.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.07.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Notice concerning a request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1999 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1999 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |