|
12.04.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
11.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |