|
10.05.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.09.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
27.05.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.10.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.1999 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1998 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
29 |