|
09.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.08.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2006 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.05.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
23.09.1999 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1998 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.1998 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
29.05.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |