EP0908252 - Method and device for controling wear of crimping pliers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [1999/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüegg, Urs Bleichestrasse 7 8640 Rapperswill / CH | 02 /
Friedli, Matthias Tägernstrasse 40 8127 Forch / CH | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98811004.5 | 06.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | CH19970002388 | 13.10.1997 Original published format: CH 238897 | [1999/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908252 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908252 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/04 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
B25B27/10 (EP,US);
B21D39/04 (EP,US);
G01N3/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/28] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Verschleissprüfung an einer Presszange | [1999/15] | English: | Method and device for controling wear of crimping pliers | [1999/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'usure d'une pince à sertir | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/48] | 06.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19616975 (FOELL REMSWERK [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]CH687368 (GEBERIT AG [CH]); | [DA]DE29602238U (NOVOPRESS GMBH [DE]); | [DA]DE29604276U (NOVOPRESS GMBH [DE]) |