|
11.09.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.08.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.07.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
175 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.03.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.04.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.04.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.12.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
270 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
93 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.06.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |