EP1014892 - DEVICE FOR REPAIRING RUPTURED ACHILLES TENDON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assal, Mathieu 6, avenue de la Grenade 1207 Genève / CH | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Martin, Didier, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [2000/27] | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry Cabinet Didier Martin 47, rue Benoit Bennier 69260 Charbonnières-les Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 98900642.4 | 30.01.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998IB00121 | Priority number, date | CH19970000246 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: CH 24697 | [2000/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834566 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014892 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014892 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/08, A61B17/04, A61B17/11 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0625 (EP,US);
A61B17/1146 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERGREIFEN EINER GERISSENEN SEHNE | [2000/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR REPAIRING RUPTURED ACHILLES TENDON | [2000/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RATTRAPAGE D'UN TENDON ROMPU | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 25.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | NEWDEAL, Société Anonyme Parc d'Activités Garigliano 31 38200 Vienne / FR | Date: | 27.01.2001 | [2001/14] | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1169626 ; | [A]US4723548 (LALONDE DONALD H [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5251642 (HANDLOS KURT E [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 21; figures 3,4,8 *; | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, 5, Derwent World Patents Index, (19860801), vol. 86, no. 29, Database accession no. 86-188399, XP002060785 & SU1169626 A 19850730 (DANILOV A A) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - KAKIUCHI M., "A COMBINED OPEN AND PERCUTANOUS TECHNIQUE FOR REPAIR OF TENDO ACHILLIS", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY. BRITISH VOLUME, UNITED KINGDOM, (199501), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 60 - 63, XP002060784 [A] 1 * figure 2 * |