|
22.02.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Declaration that a search is not possible |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.1999 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
60 |