blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972050

EP0972050 - CSK HOMOLOGONS KINAZE (CHK) FOR DETECTING AND TREATING BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2002  [2002/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
One Deaconess Drive
Boston, MA 02215 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / AVRAHAM, Hava
22 Heath Hill Road
Brookline, MA 02135 / US
02 / GROOPMAN, Jerome, E.
79 Druce Street
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Harvey, David Gareth, et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Harvey, David Gareth, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date98901751.207.01.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US00420
Priority number, dateUS19970035228P08.01.1997         Original published format: US 35228 P
US1997087688216.06.1997         Original published format: US 876882
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9830704
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972050
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/54, G01N33/50, C12N9/12, A61K38/45, A61K48/00, A61K9/127
[2000/03]
CPC:
C12N9/1205 (EP,US); A61K38/45 (EP,US); C07K14/71 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US); G01N33/57415 (EP,US); A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2799/023 (EP,US); C12N2799/026 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:KINASEHOMOLOG CSK (CHK) ZUR ERKENNUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS[2000/03]
English:CSK HOMOLOGONS KINAZE (CHK) FOR DETECTING AND TREATING BREAST CANCER[2000/03]
French:KINASE HOMOLOGUE CSK (CHK) UTILISEE DANS LA DETECTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
01.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/07]
06.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PX]  - ZRIHAN-LICHT S ET AL, "Association of csk-homologous kinase (CHK) (formerly MATK) with HER-2/ErbB-2 in breast cancer cells.", J BIOL CHEM, JAN 17 1997, 272 (3) P1856-63, UNITED STATES, XP002066240 [PX] 1-11 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.3.1856
 [T]  - ZRIHAN-LICHT S ET AL, "Csk homologous kinase, a novel signaling molecule, directly associates with the activated ErbB-2 receptor in breast cancer cells and inhibits their proliferation.", J BIOL CHEM, FEB 13 1998, 273 (7) P4065-72, UNITED STATES, XP002066241

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.7.4065
International search[PX]  - ZRIHAN-LICHT S ET AL, "Association of csk-homologous kinase (CHK) (formerly MATK) with HER-2/ErbB-2 in breast cancer cells.", J BIOL CHEM, JAN 17 1997, 272 (3) P1856-63, UNITED STATES, XP002066240 [PX] 1-11 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.3.1856
 [T]  - ZRIHAN-LICHT S ET AL, "Csk homologous kinase, a novel signaling molecule, directly associates with the activated ErbB-2 receptor in breast cancer cells and inhibits their proliferation.", J BIOL CHEM, FEB 13 1998, 273 (7) P4065-72, UNITED STATES, XP002066241

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.7.4065
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.