blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0950249

EP0950249 - HIGH OLEIC ACID ELECTRICAL INSULATION FLUIDS AND DEVICES CONTAINING THE FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB POWER T & D COMPANY INC.
Centennial Campus - NCSU, 1021 Main Campus Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
[1999/42]
Inventor(s)01 / OOMMEN, Thottathil, V.
4808 Kaplaan
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
02 / CLAIBORNE, C., Clair
925 Hall Avenue
Sharon, PA 16146 / US
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98902772.705.01.1998
[1999/42]
WO1998US00242
Priority number, dateUS1997077860806.01.1997         Original published format: US 778608
[1999/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9831021
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0950249
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0950249
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01B3/20
[1999/42]
CPC:
C10M169/04 (EP,US); H01B3/20 (EP,US); C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US); C10M2207/08 (EP,US); C10M2207/2805 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2835 (EP,US); C10M2207/401 (EP,US); C10N2020/067 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US); C10N2040/14 (EP,US); C10N2040/16 (EP,US);
C10N2040/17 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/42]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROISOLIERFLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT EINEM HOHEN GEHALT AN ÖLSAURE SOWIE VORRICHTUNGEN DIE DIESE FLÜSSIGKEITEN ENTHALTEN[1999/42]
English:HIGH OLEIC ACID ELECTRICAL INSULATION FLUIDS AND DEVICES CONTAINING THE FLUIDS[1999/42]
French:FLUIDES D'ISOLATION ELECTRIQUE RICHES EN ACIDE OLEIQUE ET APPAREILS CONTENANT CES FLUIDES[1999/42]
Entry into regional phase09.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Search fee paid 
09.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2003Fee for grant paid
19.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US4627192  (FICK GERHARDT N [US]);
 [X]US5260077  (CARRICK VIRGINIA A [US], et al);
 [X]US5336423  (PIALET JOSEPH W [US], et al);
 [X]US5429761  (HAVELKA KATHLEEN O [US], et al);
 [X]US5538654  (LAWATE SAURABH S [US], et al);
 [X]US5580482  (CHASAN DAVID E [US], et al);
 [Y]JPS5225298  (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD)
 [Y]  - UOP, FOOD PRODUCTS AND PROCESSES, "Sustane, Food Grade Antioxidants", 1994, pages 3 and 7.
 [Y]  - CIBA, PRODUCT INFORMATION, Data Notes, No. 12, March 1996.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.