EP0960349 - OPTICAL DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AOFR Pty Limited 2 Faulding Street Symonston, ACT 2609 / AU | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIAS, Martin, Charles 126 Scrivener Street O'Connor, ACT 2601 / AU | 02 /
MADDEN, Stephen, John 9 Dettman Close Isaacs, ACT 2609 / AU | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds, West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98902853.5 | 13.02.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998AU00089 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO05116 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: AU PO511697 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836302 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960349 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/293, H04J14/02 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/29317 (EP);
G02B6/29353 (EP);
G02B6/29355 (EP);
G02B6/2938 (EP);
H04J14/02 (EP);
G02B6/02076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/48] | Title | German: | Optische Elemente und Verfahren | [1999/48] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICES AND METHODS | [1999/48] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDE OPTIQUES | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0638837 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [X] 1,17,41,57* abstract *; | [X]US5457760 (MIZRAHI VICTOR [US]) [X] 1,17,41,57 * abstract * * column 4 - column 7 *; | [X]EP0713110 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 72-74,80 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 50 *; | [X]US5557439 (ALEXANDER STEPHEN B [US], et al) [X] 72-74,80 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 43 * | International search | [A]JP07336324 ; | [A]JP06244797 ; | [A]JP06347836 ; | [A]GB2295247 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [A]EP0724314 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 96, No. 4; & JP,A,07 336 324 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) 23 December 1995., & JP07336324 A 19951223 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 629; & JP,A,06 244 797 (FUJI ELECTROCHEM CO LTD) 2 September 1994., & JP06244797 A 19940902 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 95, No. 3; & JP,A,06 347 836 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH) 22 December 1994., & JP06347836 A 19941222 |