blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969812

EP0969812 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING GLYCERIN AND PROPYLENE GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester
New York 14604-2701 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED
One Bausch & Lomb Place
Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HU, Zhenze
28 Wenham Lane
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
02 / DENICK, John
290 Tobey Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98904734.529.01.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US01649
Priority number, dateUS1997079469029.01.1997         Original published format: US 794690
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9832421
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969812
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969812
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
A61K9/0048 (EP,US); A61K9/00 (KR); A61P27/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT GLYZERIN UND PROPYLENGLYCOL[2000/02]
English:OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING GLYCERIN AND PROPYLENE GLYCOL[2000/02]
French:COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES COMPORTANT DE LA GLYCERINE ET DU PROPYLENE GLYCOL[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1999National basic fee paid 
07.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2003Fee for grant paid
24.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH06298649  ;
 [X]WO9200707  (INSITE VISION INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-3,9-11 * * page 15, line 24 - line 30 * * page 18, line 4 - line 23 * * page 21, line 20 - page 22, line 2 *;
 [X]EP0580074  (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * page 5; example 7 *;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 02, Database accession no. 95-011747, XP002064494 & JPH06298649 A 19941025 (TEIKA SEIYAKU) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.