EP0969112 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING DUAL-PHASE HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEETS HAVING HIGH IMPACT ENERGY ABSORPTION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/01] | DUAL-PHASE HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT DYNAMIC DEFORMATION PROPERTIES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | ||
[2011/03] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENISHI, Akihiro c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Manabu c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | 03 /
KURIYAMA, Yukihisa c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | 04 /
SAKUMA, Yasuharu c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu City, Chiba 299-1193 / JP | 05 /
KAWANO, Osamu c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | 06 /
WAKITA, Junichi c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | 07 /
MABUCHI, Hidesato c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
UENISHI, Akihiro c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Manabu c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
KURIYAMA, Yukihisa c/o Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKUMA, Yasuharu c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu City, Chiba 299-1193 / JP | |||
05 /
KAWANO, Osamu c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | |||
06 /
WAKITA, Junichi c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | |||
07 /
MABUCHI, Hidesato c/o Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | |||
Former [2000/01] | 01 /
UENISHI, Akihiro. Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, chiba 293-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Manabu, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
KURIYAMA, Yukihisa, Nippon Steel Corporation Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu City, Chiba 293-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKUMA, Yasuharu, Nippon Steel Corp. Kimitsu Works 1, Kimitsu Kimitsu City, Chiba 299-1193 / JP | |||
05 /
KAWANO, Osamu, Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | |||
06 /
WAKITA, Junichi, Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | |||
07 /
MABUCHI, Hidesato, Nippon Steel Corp. Oita Works 1, Oaza-Nishinosu Oita City, Oita 870-8566 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/10] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907247.5 | 16.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998JP01101 | Priority number, date | JP19970082434 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8243497 | JP19970190297 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19029797 | JP19970190299 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19029997 | JP19970223008 | 06.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22300897 | JP19970258938 | 24.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25893897 | [2000/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841664 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969112 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969112 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0969112 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/50, C21D8/02, C21D9/46 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/00 (KR);
C23C2/024 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/02 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C23C2/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2017/10] |
Former [2000/01] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWEIPHASEN HOCHFESTEN STAHLBLECHEN MIT ERHÖHTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN ZUR ABSORPTION VON AUFPRALLENERGIE | [2016/22] | English: | A METHOD OF PRODUCING DUAL-PHASE HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEETS HAVING HIGH IMPACT ENERGY ABSORPTION PROPERTIES | [2011/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DES TOLES D'ACIER BIPHASEES A HAUTE RESISTANCE MÉCANIQUE ET A HAUTE CAPACITÉ D'ABSORPTION D'ENERGIE DE CHOCK | [2011/03] |
Former [2000/01] | ZWEIPHASEN HOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH MIT AUSGEZEICHNETEN DYNAMISCHEN UMFORMUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2000/01] | DUAL-PHASE HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT DYNAMIC DEFORMATION PROPERTIES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | ||
Former [2000/01] | TOLE D'ACIER BIPHASE A HAUTE RESISTANCE AYANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIETES DE DEFORMATION DYNAMIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1999 | Translation filed | 29.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10181225.3 / EP2314729 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2012
24.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2012
24.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 22.06.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.12.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.04.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.01.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0790482 ; | [A]JPH08325671 ; | [XA]EP0719868 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 11 * figure 3; example 2; claims 1,6,8 * [A] 12 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07090482 A 19950404 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08325671 A 19961210 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0790482 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH083677 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH08176738 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH08176723 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) | by applicant | JPS59219473 | Opposition | US5123969 | - O. MAID ET AL., "Herstellung von Warmband aus Dualphasen-Stahl mit Haspeltemperaturen unterhalb der Martensitstart-Temperatur", THYSSEN TECHNISCHE BERICHTE, (1985), no. 1/85, pages 28 - 33 | - G. BÉRANGER ET AL., The Book of Steel, PARIS, LAVOISIER PUBLISHERS, (1996), vol. 59, pages 1208 - 1211 | - S. MASATOSCHI ET AL., Influence of Microstructure on Yielding Behavior in Continuous-Annealed Multi-Phase Sheet Steels, PENNSYLVANIA, THE METALLURGICAL SOCIETY OF AIME, (1985), pages 341 - 360 |