blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0963514

EP0963514 - METHOD FOR REGULATING A CONTROLLED VARIABLE WITH LIMITED CONTROLLER INTERVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HARTKE, Andreas
Pfitznerstrasse 7A
D-80807 München / DE
02 / PRZYMUSINSKI, Achim
Dr. -Leo-Ritter-strasse 21
D-93049 Regensburg / DE
[2000/02]
Former [1999/50]01 / HARTKE, Andreas
Schönwerthstrasse 4
D-93049 Regensburg / DE
02 / PRZYMUSINSKI, Achim
Grasser Weg 70
D-93053 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date98909322.403.02.1998
[1999/50]
WO1998DE00298
Priority number, dateDE199710830828.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19708308
[1999/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9838423
Date:03.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963514
Date:15.12.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963514
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/38
[1999/50]
CPC:
F02D41/3863 (EP,US); F02D35/0007 (EP,US); F02M63/0225 (EP,US);
G05B13/024 (EP,US); F02D2041/2027 (EP,US); F02D2200/0602 (EP,US);
F02D2250/31 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINER REGELGRÖSSE MIT EINEM BEGRENZTEN REGLEREINGRIFF[1999/50]
English:METHOD FOR REGULATING A CONTROLLED VARIABLE WITH LIMITED CONTROLLER INTERVENTION[1999/50]
French:PROCEDE POUR REGULER UNE GRANDEUR AVEC UNE INTERVENTION LIMITEE DU REGULATEUR[1999/50]
Entry into regional phase20.08.1999National basic fee paid 
20.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2002Fee for grant paid
04.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US5121604  (BERGER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7;
 [A]WO9603577  (FIAT RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1-7;
 [A]EP0735268  (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [A] 1-7;
 [PA]WO9743543  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al)[PA] 1-7
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1,2,5,7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.