EP0935890 - METHOD FOR DATA TRANSMISSION TO SLAVE EXCHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENTIKÄINEN, Jukka Tammipolku 10 E FIN-36200 Kangasala / FI | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98910769.3 | 23.03.1998 | [1999/33] | WO1998FI00256 | Priority number, date | FI19970001229 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: FI 971229 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9843445 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0935890 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/58 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP);
H04Q5/00 (KR);
H04Q3/0029 (EP);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP);
H04Q2213/13174 (EP);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG ZU NEBEN-VERMITTLUNGSANLAGEN | [1999/33] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA TRANSMISSION TO SLAVE EXCHANGES | [1999/33] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES DONNEES A DES UNITES D'ECHANGE ASSERVIES | [1999/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 05.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9621985 (STRATACOM INC [US]); | [A]EP0702496 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]WO9320524 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |