EP0918937 - FUEL SUPPLY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBLER, Klaus Bettaeckerstrasse 12 D-70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
HUEBEL, Michael Schillerstrasse 58 D-70839 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
STROHL, Willi Rieslingstrasse 13 D-71717 Beilstein / DE | [1999/22] | Application number, filing date | 98912245.2 | 17.02.1998 | [1999/22] | WO1998DE00451 | Priority number, date | DE1997125941 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19725941 | [1999/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859173 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918937 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D5/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
F02M37/048 (EP,US);
F04D13/06 (KR);
F04D13/0646 (EP,US);
F04D5/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/22] | Title | German: | FÖRDERAGGREGAT FÜR KRAFTSTOFF | [1999/22] | English: | FUEL SUPPLY UNIT | [1999/22] | French: | GROUPE D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/24] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2697986 (MEAGHER JR JAMES M) [A] 1-3,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3500755 (GIBSON WILLIAM H) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE2012560 (SIEPER H) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 3, line 9 - line 35 * [A] 8; | [A]DE2027254 (HILGE MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 7 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3861028 (MITTAG HERMANN) [A] 5* abstract *; | [A]WO9119103 (NU TECH IND INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE4020521 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4331803 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [YA]DE4341564 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 9; figures 4,5 * [A] 6,8 | by applicant | WO9525885 |