|
12.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
14.06.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.06.2007 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.11.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
68 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.11.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.1999 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
08.09.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |