EP0975445 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING PIPING WITH A VERTICAL SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matlschweiger, Peter Trefflingerstrasse 5 4650 Lambach / AT | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2000/05] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 98913427.5 | 15.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998AT00094 | Priority number, date | AT19970000653 | 16.04.1997 Original published format: AT 65397 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846374 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975445 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975445 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/04, E03F9/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
E03F9/005 (EP,US);
B08B9/04 (KR);
B08B9/045 (EP,US);
E03F9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN EINER ROHRLEITUNG MIT FALLSTRANG | [2000/05] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING PIPING WITH A VERTICAL SECTION | [2000/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE NETTOYAGE D'UNE CANALISATION COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE VERTICALE | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.01.2002 | IE | 15.04.2002 | LU | 15.04.2002 | ES | 16.04.2002 | SE | 16.04.2002 | BE | 30.04.2002 | CH | 30.04.2002 | DK | 30.04.2002 | LI | 30.04.2002 | [2008/23] |
Former [2004/39] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
LU | 15.04.2002 | ||
ES | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
BE | 30.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/28] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
ES | 16.04.2002 | ||
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
BE | 30.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
BE | 30.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | IE | 15.04.2002 | |
SE | 16.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 16.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2074213 (DEEM KATHERINE V) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1565474 (SOCIÉTÉ DE CANALISATIONS, CURAGE ET ASSAINISSEMENT (S.O.C.C.A.)) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]NL6804149 (N.V. INGENIEURSBUREAU VOOR SYSTEMEN EN OCTROOIEN "SPANSTAAL") [A] 1,2* page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 8; figure . *; | [DA]DE3427371 (WENDLER KLAUS DIETER) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 5; figure - * |