|
27.04.2012 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.05.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
68 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
69 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
56 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2007 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
44 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
45 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.05.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
21.10.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
31 |