|
14.10.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.02.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2003 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2003 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
52 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
52 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
52 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Annex |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Annex |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Annex |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.02.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.10.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
29 |