EP0981738 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION AND THE QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF VOLATILE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAL-X Investment S.A 6 Avenue de Frontenex 1207 Geneva / CH | [2002/13] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Transdiffusia S.A. 7, avenue Krieg 1208 Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMARTINE, Roger 166, avenue Roger Salengro F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
COLEMAN, Anthony 3, rue de Margnolles F-69300 Caluire / FR | 03 /
GORELOFF, Philippe 16, avenue Pasteur F-01700 Saint Maurice de Beynost / FR | 04 /
CHOQUARD, Philippe 23, chemin de la Gradelle CH-1223 Cologny / CH | 05 /
MARCILLAC, Arnold 3, route du Port F-01150 Saint Sorlin en Bugey / FR | 06 /
MARTELIN, Yvon 8, chemin des Bottes F-01700 Saint Maurice de Beynost / FR | [2000/28] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
LAMARTINE, Roger 166, avenue Roger Salengro F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | ||
02 /
COLEMAN, Anthony, Université Claude Bernard 43, boulevard du 11 Novembre 1918 F-69622 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
03 /
GORELOFF, Philippe 16, avenue Pasteur F-01700 Saint Maurice de Beynost / FR | |||
04 /
CHOQUARD, Philippe 23, chemin de la Gradelle CH-1223 Cologny / CH | |||
05 /
MARCILLAC, Arnold 3, route du Port F-01150 Saint Sorlin en Bugey / FR | |||
06 /
MARTELIN, Yvon 8, chemin des Bottes F-01700 Saint Maurice de Beynost / FR | Representative(s) | Mohnhaupt, Dietrich IPTO S.A. Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Mohnhaupt, Dietrich IPTO S.A., Route de la Fonderie 8 1705 Fribourg / CH | Application number, filing date | 98917493.3 | 11.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998IB00696 | Priority number, date | CH19970001118 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: CH 111897 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852028 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981738 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981738 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G01N29/036 (EP);
G01N2291/0257 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTSTELLUNG UND ZUR QUANTITATIVEN ANALYSE VON FLÜCHTIGEN STOFFEN | [2000/09] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION AND THE QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF VOLATILE SUBSTANCES | [2000/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DETECTION ET L'ANALYSE QUANTITATIVE DE SUBSTANCES VOLATILES | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.02.2003 | CH | 19.02.2003 | FR | 19.02.2003 | LI | 19.02.2003 | GB | 19.05.2003 | DE | 20.05.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | BE | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
GB | 19.05.2003 | ||
DE | 20.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | BE | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
DE | 20.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
DE | 20.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4317995 (R. F. D. BRADSHAW) [A] 12 * abstract * | [Y] - DICKERT F L ET AL, "MASS-SENSITIVE SOLVENT VAPOR DETECTION WITH CALIX 4RESORCINARENES:TUNING SENSITIVITY AND PREDICTING SENSOR EFFECTS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970315), vol. 69, no. 6, pages 1001 - 1005, XP000686379 [Y] 1,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac9605859 | [Y] - F. L. DICKERT, "SUPRAMOLECULAR DETECTION OF SOLVENT VAPOURS WITH CALIXARENES: MASS-SENSITIVE SENSORS, MOLECULAR MECHANICS AND BET STUDIES", MIKROCHIM. ACTA, AT, (1995), vol. 119, no. 1-2, pages 55 - 62, XP002071274 [Y] 1,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01244854 | [A] - M. MCCARRICK, "ASSESSMENT OF A CHROMOGENIC CALIX(4)ARENE FOR THE RAPID COLORIMETRIC DETECTION OF TRIMETHYLAMINE", J. MATER. CHEM., (1994), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 217 - 221, XP002071275 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jm9940400217 | [A] - J. AUGE, "VERSTILE MICROCONTROLLED GAS SENSOR ARRAY SYSTEM USING THE QUARTZ MICROBALANCE PRINCIPLE AND PATTERN RECOGNITION METHODS", SENS. AND ACTUATORS, B, (1995), vol. B26, no. 1-3, pages 181 - 186, XP000508680 [A] 1 * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(94)01582-3 | [A] - J. HARTMANN, "SUPRAMOLECULAR INTERACTIONS ON MASS SENSITIVE SENSORS IN GAS PHASES AND LIQUIDS", SENS. AND ACTUATORS, B, (1996), vol. B34, no. 1-3, pages 305 - 311, XP004077996 [A] 1 * page 308, paragraph 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(96)01893-X |