EP0977650 - FASTENER, DIE BUTTON AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A FASTENER INTO A PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whitesell International Corporation 22100 Trolley Industrial Drive Taylor, MI 48180 / US | [2005/40] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Fabristeel Products, Inc. 22900 West Eight Mile Road Southfield, MI 48034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Stanley, E. 1445 Longfellow Drive Canton, MI 48187 / US | 02 /
QUICK, Gilbert, C., Jr. 18339 Mayfield Livonia, MI 48152 / US | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/40] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/06] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98918617.6 | 23.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998US08176 | Priority number, date | US19970044219P | 23.04.1997 Original published format: US 44219 P | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9848177 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977650 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/06, F16B37/06 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
F16B37/068 (EP,US);
B23P19/062 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49835 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49908 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49915 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/06] | B23P19/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/06] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT UND METHODE DER INSTALLATION | [2000/06] | English: | FASTENER, DIE BUTTON AND METHOD OF INSTALLING A FASTENER INTO A PANEL | [2000/06] | French: | ORGANE D'ASSEMBLAGE, MATRICE D'EMBOUTISSAGE ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN PLACE D'ORGANE D'ASSEMBLAGE DANS UN PANNEAU | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5199837 (GOSS DAVID [US]); | [X]US4543701 (MUELLER RUDOLF R M [DE]); | [A]US4825527 (LADOUCEUR HAROLD A [US]) |