EP0982363 - (METH)ACRYLIC RESIN COMPOSITION FOR THERMOSET INJECTION MOLDING, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOLDINGS OF (METH)ACRYLIC RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYANAGI, Seiya Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-60, Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8677 / JP | 02 /
KISHIMOTO, Yuichiro Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-60, Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8677 / JP | 03 /
YANASE, Akitada Toyohashi Plants Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | 04 /
KAZEHAYA, Yuuji Toyohashi Plants Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98919562.3 | 12.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998JP02088 | Priority number, date | JP19970124203 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12420397 | [2000/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851743 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982363 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/12, C08F2/44, C04B26/06, B29C45/00, B29K33/04 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/22 (KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08L33/12 (KR);
C08K2201/005 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | (METH)ACRYLHARZ-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR WÄRMEHÄRTENDEN SPRITZGUSS , VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER (METH)ACRYLHARZFORMEN | [2000/09] | English: | (METH)ACRYLIC RESIN COMPOSITION FOR THERMOSET INJECTION MOLDING, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF THE COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOLDINGS OF (METH)ACRYLIC RESINS | [2000/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINES (METH)ACRYLIQUES POUR PIECE MOULEE PAR INJECTION THERMODURCIE, PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PIECES MOULEES EN RESINES (METH)ACRYLIQUES | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1999 | Translation filed | 13.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 19.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0749990 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-13 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 44; examples 1,4; table 1 *; | [X]JPH07188505 ; | [E]EP0894828 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [E] 1-8,12-15 * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 53 * * page 8, line 1 - line 4; example -; claims 1,2,9,10,17,18; table - *; | [E]EP0976786 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [E] 1-7,12,13,15 * table - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07188505 A 19950725 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH09111084 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JPH09110497 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JPH08225705 (M R C DU PONT KK, et al); | [Y]JPS4721447 ; | [Y]JPS57212225 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) |