EP1001155 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALCULATING CRUISING RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADAHIRO, Takashi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Masahiro, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
NOUNEN, Michiyasu, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
ARAKI, Mikio, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98921891.2 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998JP02392 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963215 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001155 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00, G01F9/00, G01F23/00, B60R16/02 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B60W50/0098 (EP);
G01F23/0007 (EP);
G01F23/804 (EP);
G01F9/008 (EP);
G01F9/023 (EP);
B60W2530/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERECHNUNG DES DURCHSCHNITTLICHEN BEREICHES | [2000/20] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALCULATING CRUISING RANGE | [2000/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL D'AUTONOMIE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1999 | Translation filed | 13.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.02.2010 | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/18] | 26.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 24.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP07009319.0 / EP1865180 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4046998 (KUNO AKIRA, et al) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 1 - column 7; figure 1; claims 1-7 * [Y] 2-5,7,8,12-15,17; | [X]GB2015739 (BENDIX CORP) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US4564905 (MASUDA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [XY]JPS56137214 ; | [X]JPS61277019 ; | [Y]DE3825630 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4437342 (HOSAKA AKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,11 * column 6, line 5 - line 20 *; | [Y]US5542394 (TOMISAWA NAOKI [JP]) [Y] 2,4,7,11,12,14,17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0683382 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [Y] 3,5,13,15 * column 1 - column 8; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]JPH01257222 ; | [Y]JPH04337421 ; | [Y]JPS57189016 ; | [Y]JPS6325517 ; | [A]JPS59204714 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820126), vol. 006, no. 013, Database accession no. (P - 099), & JP56137214 A 19811027 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,5,11,15 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,7,13,14,17 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870502), vol. 011, no. 137, Database accession no. (P - 572), & JP61277019 A 19861208 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD) [X] 1,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900109), vol. 014, no. 004, Database accession no. (P - 986), & JP01257222 A 19891013 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 3,4,7,13,14,17 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930409), vol. 017, no. 184, Database accession no. (P - 1519), & JP04337421 A 19921125 (JAPAN ELECTRON CONTROL SYST CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830210), vol. 007, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 175), & JP57189016 A 19821120 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 15 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880705), vol. 012, no. 233, Database accession no. (P - 724), & JP63025517 A 19880203 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST CO LTD) [Y] 1,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850402), vol. 009, no. 072, Database accession no. (P - 345), & JP59204714 A 19841120 (KOITO SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH01257222 (YAZAKI CORP); | [Y]JPH0534185 (JAPAN ENGINE VALVE MFG); | [Y]JPS61178014U ; | [Y]JPH03130516U ; | [Y]JPS6461615 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPS61215921 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPS61193999 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH04131715 (YAZAKI CORP); | [Y]JPS6194719U ; | [X]JPH02141899 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPS54108322 (NIPPON SOKEN); | [Y]JPS6325517 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST); | [X]JPS59135412U ; | [X]JPS61277019 (JAPAN ENGINE VALVE MFG); | [Y]JPH1061514 (YUTANI JUKO KK, et al); | [Y]JPH08218962 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH07286549 (UNISIA JECS CORP); | [Y]JPH09216541 (HARNESS SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) |