EP0978020 - PROPORTIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Martin Brahmstrasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98922762.4 | 22.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998EP02374 | Priority number, date | DE19971016897 | 22.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716897 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9848329 | Date: | 29.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978020 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978020 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/00, G05D16/16, G05D11/035, G05D11/13, G01F1/74, G01F11/06, F16K31/365 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G01F13/00 (EP,US);
G01F1/363 (EP,US);
G01F1/383 (EP,US);
G05D7/0676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/06] | Title | German: | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG | [2000/06] | English: | PROPORTIONER | [2000/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 08.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | DK | 19.03.2002 | AT | 22.04.2002 | CH | 30.04.2002 | LI | 30.04.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2003/47] | NL | 19.12.2001 | |
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
AT | 22.04.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 19.12.2001 | |
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | NL | 19.12.2001 | |
CH | 30.04.2002 | ||
LI | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 19.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2064826 (AGMET INSTR) [A] 1-8* column 2, line 127 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]US4330003 (D ALONZO LODOVICO) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 9-21 * * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP0239331 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 1-22 * * column 6, line 4 - column 14, line 3; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-8 |