EP0997761 - OPTICAL DEVICE, METHOD OF CLEANING THE SAME, PROJECTION ALIGNER, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAGAWA, Masayuki, Nikon Corp. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Osamu, Nikon Corp. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
TANIUCHI, Taichi, Nikon Corp. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/18] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98923177.4 | 09.06.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998JP02536 | Priority number, date | JP19970152695 | 10.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15269597 | [2000/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857213 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0997761 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, H01L21/30, G03F7/20 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/70933 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70058 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70241 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70825 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70883 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG,VERFAHREN ZU DEREN REINIGUNG,PROJEKTIONSAUSRICHTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2000/18] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE, METHOD OF CLEANING THE SAME, PROJECTION ALIGNER, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE, DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT DE PROJECTION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1999 | Translation filed | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4699505 (KOMORIYA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,30,35,40 * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 59; figure 8 *; | [XA]US4704348 (KOIZUMI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 35 * column 2, line 1 - line 36 * * column 5, line 30 - line 52 * [A] 1,8,30; | [X]FR2708757 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,18-20,30,35,40 * page 8, line 23 - page 16, line 32; figure - *; | [XY]US5430303 (MATSUMOTO YUKAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,15-17,30,35,38-40,42-45,64-69 * the whole document * [Y] 31; | [YA]EP0663618 (ASM LITHOGRAPHY BV [NL]) [Y] 31 * page 3, line 16 - line 24 * * page 5, line 34 - line 43; claim 4 *[A] 1-75; | [X]WO9533594 (AMADA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,64 * page 3, line 15 - page 12, line 9; figures 1,2B *; | [A]US5559584 (MIYAJI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-75 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 51 *; | [E]EP0867774 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [E] 1-3,18-20,30,31,35,38-40,64 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH03154390 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]JPH03155611 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH0855792 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH08509652 |