|
06.07.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
19.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
68 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |