|
07.01.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.12.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.12.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
02.05.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.04.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.12.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.11.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Description |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |