EP1010457 - POROUS POLYVINYLIDENE FLUORIDE RESIN FILM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hitoshi 2-207, Aza-nakahara 5-chome, Onahama Iwaki-shi, Fukushima 971-8101 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMURA, Masakazu 33-3, Yokoo 2-chome, Suma-ku Koube-shi, Hyogo 654-0131 / JP | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98928604.2 | 22.06.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998JP02762 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967013 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010457 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/34, C08J9/26, C08J9/28, D01D5/24, D01F6/12 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D67/00113 (EP,US);
B01D67/00111 (EP,US);
B01D67/002 (EP);
B01D67/0027 (EP);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D69/081 (EP,US);
B01D69/0871 (EP,US);
B01D69/1411 (EP,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
D01F1/08 (EP);
D01F6/12 (EP,US);
B01D2323/081 (EP,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP);
B01D2323/18 (EP);
B01D2325/04 (EP,US);
B01D2325/22 (EP,US);
B01D2325/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/25] | Title | German: | PORÖSER POLYVINYLIDENFLUORIDHARZFILM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/25] | English: | POROUS POLYVINYLIDENE FLUORIDE RESIN FILM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/25] | French: | FILM POREUX D'UNE RESINE DE FLUORURE DE POLYVINYLIDENE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1999 | Translation filed | 15.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/10] | Appeal following examination | 26.01.2009 | Appeal received No. T0803/09 | 02.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.01.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | 04.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.09.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP07117715.8 / EP1897606 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62179540 | International search | [A]JPS5180686 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS5893734 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH01224005 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH03215535 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | by applicant | EP0282698 |