EP0991352 - DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR FLOWABLE LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDENBURG, Allen, Eugene 1307 Kittansett Cove Austin, TX 78746 / US | 02 /
MALDONADO, John, Ethan 2606 Amaranth Houston, TX 77084 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98928913.7 | 05.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US11710 | Priority number, date | US19970882886 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 882886 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900043 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991352 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991352 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
A47K5/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | SPENDESYSTEM FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/15] | English: | DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR FLOWABLE LIQUIDS | [2000/15] | French: | SYSTEM DE DISTRIBUTION POUR LIQUIDES FLUIDES | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.04.2003 | FR | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 09.04.2003 | |
FR | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
DE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | BE | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
DE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | |
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5261557 (BYTELL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,12,20 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US5431304 (GENTILE ALISEO [US]); | [A]WO9716107 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,12,20 * abstract *; | [A]WO9717879 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,12,20 * abstract * |