EP0991630 - CRYSTALLINE ROXIFIBAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company 203 Longmeadow Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2002/19] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states DuPont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURIN, Michael, B. 28 Country Gates Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | 02 /
MA, Philip 29 Constitution Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 03 /
MELONI, David, J. 34 Fantail Court New Castle, DE 19720 / US | 04 /
PESTI, Jaan, A. 605 Country Club Drive Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | 05 /
ROSSANO, Lucius, T. 7 West Ridge Court Newark, DE 19711 / US | 06 /
WARD, Randall, K. 5111 East Brigantine Court Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 07 /
YIN, Jianguo 19 Signal Hill Drive Hockessin, DE 19809 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, Lin-Hua 90 Gilliotti Road New Fairfield, CT 06812 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98929063.0 | 12.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12367 | Priority number, date | US19970049712P | 16.06.1997 Original published format: US 49712 P | US19970049633P | 16.06.1997 Original published format: US 49633 P | US19980080278P | 01.04.1998 Original published format: US 80278 P | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857939 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991630 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/04, A61K31/42 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C07D261/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Extension states | LT | 25.11.1999 | LV | 25.11.1999 | RO | 25.11.1999 | SI | 25.11.1999 | Title | German: | KRISTALLUNE ROXIFIBAN | [2000/15] | English: | CRYSTALLINE ROXIFIBAN | [2000/15] | French: | ROXIFIBAN CRISTALLIN | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9514683 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-50 * see pages 153-156,examples 314 a and b; page 261 - page 267; claim - *; | [Y] - LIN-HUA ZHANG ET AL, "The enantiospecific synthesis of an isoxazoline.A RGD mimic platelet GPIIb/IIIa antagonist", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19970418), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 2466 - 2470, XP002077679 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document * | [Y] - LIN-HUA ZHANG ET AL, "The chiral specific synthesis of DMP 754 a platelet GPIIb/IIIa antagonist", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (19960624), vol. 37, no. 26, pages 4455 - 4458, XP002077680 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document * |