|
20.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.12.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
43 |
|
26.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
19.10.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2007 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2007 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.08.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.08.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
06.01.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2000 |
|
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
36 |