|
27.03.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
28.12.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
20 |
|
14.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2000 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Translation of description |
Search / examination |
120 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Translation of the abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Translation of the abstract |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
151 |