|
17.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
17.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.10.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.07.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
10.11.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
58 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |