blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1010040

EP1010040 - LASER-ILLUMINATED STEPPER OR SCANNER WITH ENERGY SENSOR FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cymer, Inc.
17075 Thornmint Court
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
[2004/14]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Cymer, Inc.
16750 Via del Campo Court
San Diego, CA 92127-1712 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SANDSTROM, Richard, L.
305 Trailview Road
Encintas, CA 92024 / US
02 / DAS, Palash, P.
2029 Paseo De Anza
Vista, CA 92084 / US
03 / FOMENKOV, Igor, V.
14390 Janal Way
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
04 / BESAUCELE, Herve, A.
Apartment D, 8354 Via Sonoma
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
05 / OZARSKI, Robert, G.
13894 Lake Poway Road
Poway, CA 92064 / US
 [2009/03]
Former [2000/25]01 / SANDSTROM, Richard, L.
305 Trailview Road
Encintas, CA 92024 / US
02 / DAS, Palash, P.
2029 Paseo De Anza
Vista, CA 92084 / US
03 / FOMENKOV, Igor V.
14390 Janal Way
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
04 / BESAUCELE, Herve, A.
Apartment D 8354 Via Sonoma
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
05 / OZARSKI, Robert, G.
13894 Lake Poway Road
Poway, CA 92064 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98939150.331.07.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US15974
Priority number, dateUS1997090886208.08.1997         Original published format: US 908862
US1998003487004.03.1998         Original published format: US 34870
US1998008137419.05.1998         Original published format: US 81374
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9908156
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010040
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010040
Date:24.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2005
ClassificationIPC:H01S3/134, G03F7/20
[2009/02]
CPC:
G03F7/70025 (EP); G03F7/70041 (EP); G03F7/70358 (EP);
G03F7/70558 (EP); G03F7/70575 (EP); H01S3/03 (EP);
H01S3/134 (EP); H01S3/225 (EP); H01S3/036 (EP);
H01S3/08009 (EP); H01S3/2251 (EP); H01S3/2256 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2005/37]G03F7/20, H01S3/225, H01S3/134
Former IPC [2000/25]G03B27/42, G03B27/54, G03B27/60, G03B27/72, H01S3/10, H01S3/18
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/25]
TitleGerman:LASERLICHTBELEUCHTETER STEPPER ODER SCANNER MIT ENERGIESENSORRÜCKOPPLUNG[2009/02]
English:LASER-ILLUMINATED STEPPER OR SCANNER WITH ENERGY SENSOR FEEDBACK[2000/25]
French:MOTEUR PAS-A-PAS OU SCANNER ECLAIRE PAR LASER, A ASSERVISSEMENT DU CAPTEUR D'ENERGIE[2000/25]
Former [2000/25]LASERLICHTBELEUCHTETER STEPPER ODER SCANNER MIT ENERGIESENSOR FEEDBACK
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Search fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
11.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
21.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2009Fee for grant paid
29.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.06.2009
IT24.06.2009
FR24.08.2009
GB24.09.2009
ES05.10.2009
NL01.02.2010
DE02.02.2010
[2012/44]
Former [2011/26]BE24.06.2009
IT24.06.2009
FR24.08.2009
GB24.09.2009
ES05.10.2009
DE02.02.2010
Former [2010/30]BE24.06.2009
FR24.08.2009
ES05.10.2009
DE02.02.2010
Former [2010/28]BE24.06.2009
FR24.08.2009
ES05.10.2009
Former [2010/19]BE24.06.2009
ES05.10.2009
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPH08250402  ;
 [PYA]US5728495  (OZAWA KEN) [PY] 1-16 * column 3, lines 61-67 * * column 5, line 60 - column 10, line 27; figures 1,4 * [PA] 17-22;
 [PY]US5710787  (AMADA ET AL) [PY] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-11 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 67 *;
 [PY]JPH09320932  ;
 [L]US6501535  (OZAWA KEN) [L] 1 * column 8, lines 9-58; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5191374  (HAZAMA ET AL) [Y] 1,10-14 * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 19 * * column 15, line 59 - column 16, line 5; figure 14 *;
 [A]EP0766144  (CANON KK) [A] 1,17 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 49 * * figures 1,2 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08250402 A 19960927 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1,4 * [A] 17-22
 [PY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09320932 A 19971212 (NIKON CORP) [PY] 1,5,6 * abstract *
International search[AP]US5710787  ;
 [AP]US5728495
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.