|
24.03.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
28.01.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2009 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.08.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.03.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
01.02.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.02.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
12 |