EP0991664 - NOVEL PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS INTERACTING WITH GTP-BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin / DE | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. Jabotinsky Street 46 P.O. Box 4279 91042 Jerusalem / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Jabotinsky Street 46, P.O. Box 4279 91042 Jerusalem / IL | |||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTINGHOFER, Alfred Rheinlanddamm 201 D-44139 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
AHMADIAN, Mohammad, Reza Rheinlanddamm 201 D-44139 / DE | 03 /
SCHEFFZEK, Klaus Rheinlanddamm 201 D-44139 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
SELINGER, Zvi Shlomo Zemach Street 16 96190 Jerusalem / IL | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98942551.7 | 13.07.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998EP04368 | Priority number, date | EP7000001 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: PCT/EP70/00001 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902558 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991664 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K38/17, G01N33/68 | [2000/15] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | NEUE PHARMAZEUTISCH AKTIVE VERBINDUNGEN, DIE MIT GTP-BINDENDEN PROTEINEN WECHSELWIRKEN | [2000/15] | English: | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE COMPOUNDS INTERACTING WITH GTP-BINDING PROTEINS | [2000/15] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACTIFS INTERAGISSANT AVEC DES PROTEINES DE LIAISON GTP | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/35] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0496162 (MERCK & CO INC) [A] * page 4, line 20 - line 30 * | [XY] - WITTINGHOFER ET AL, "The interaction of Ras with GTPase-activating proteins", FEBS LETTERS, (199706), vol. 410, pages 63 - 67, XP002058936 [X] 1-7,11-19 * the whole document * * page 65, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 66, column 1, paragraph L * [Y] 20-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00321-9 | [XY] - M.S. MARSHALL ET AL, "A C-terminal domain of GAP is sufficient to stimulate ras p21 GTPase activity", EMBO JOURNAL., EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (1989), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 1105 - 1110, XP002058937 [X] 1-7,11-19 * the whole document * * figure 1 * [Y] 20-25 | [XDY] - SCHEFFZEK ET AL, "Cristal structure of the GTPase-activating domain of human p120GAP and implications for the interaction with Ras", NATURE, (199612), vol. 384, pages 591 - 596, XP002058938 [XD] 1-7,11-19 * the whole document * * page 595, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,4 * * page 596, column 1, paragraph L * [Y] 20-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384591a0 | [XDY] - M.R. AHMADIAN ET AL, "Structural differences in the minimal catalytic domains of the GTPase-activating proteins p120gap and Neutrofibrin", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., MD US, (199607), vol. 271, no. 27, pages 16409 - 16415, XP002058939 [XD] 1-7,11-19 * the whole document * * page 16414, column 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 16414, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 20-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.27.16409 | [Y] - KROOK M ET AL, "Selection of peptides with surface affinity for alpha-chymotrypsin using a phage display library", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (19950908), vol. 1, no. 711, page 119-128, XP004038957 [Y] 20-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(95)00270-W | [PXD] - T. ZOR ET AL., "Rescue of mutant G-protein by substrate-assisted catalysis", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (199710), vol. 249, no. 1, pages 330 - 336, XP002084695 [PXD] 1,8-10,26 * the whole document * * page 332, column 2; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.00330.x | [A] - T. ZOR ET AL, "m-acetylanilido-GTP, a novel photoaffinity label for GTP-binding proteins: synthesis and applications", BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 306, pages 253 - 258, XP002084696 [A] 1,8-10,26 * page 258, column 1, line 15 * |