EP1005735 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSESSING THE SERVICE QUALITY OF TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOETSCH, Markus Sendnicher Weg 62 D-56072 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
PLECHINGER, Jörg Westermühlstrasse 16 D-80469 München / DE | 03 /
JUNG, Peter Im Rabental 28 D-67697 Otterberg / DE | 04 /
BERENS, Friedbert Keltenweg 67 D-67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2000/23] | Application number, filing date | 98945070.5 | 29.07.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998DE02172 | Priority number, date | DE1997136653 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736653 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911013 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005735 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005735 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/20 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (KR);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/2975 (EP,US);
H03M13/299 (EP,US);
H03M13/353 (EP,US);
H03M13/6381 (EP,US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H04L1/0066 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H03M13/3738 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0059 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FI, FR, GB, SE [2005/13] |
Former [2000/23] | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG DER DIENSTQUALITÄT AUF ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANÄLEN IN EINEM DIGITALEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSESSING THE SERVICE QUALITY OF TRANSMISSION CHANNELS IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2000/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EVALUATION DE LA QUALITE DE SERVICE SUR DES CANAUX DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 22.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.05.2005 | SE | 18.08.2005 | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/50] | SE | 18.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - NASSHAN M ET AL, "New results on the application of antenna diversity and turbo-codes in a JD-CDMA mobile radio system", 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS (PIMRC'94), AND ICCC REGIONAL MEETING ON WIRELESS COMPUTER NETWORKS (WCN), THE HAGUE, THE NETHERLANDS, Amsterdam, IOS Press, Netherlands, (19940918), vol. 2, pages 524 - 528, XP002091099 [X] 1-5,8-11,14 * abstract * * page 526, column L, line 2 - line 17 * * page 527, column L, line 15 - line 27 * [Y] 6,7,12,13 | [YD] - JUNG P, "Comparison of turbo-code decoders applied to short frame transmission systems", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19960401), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 530 - 537, XP000586080 [YD] 6,7,12,13 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.490238 |