EP0999963 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A POWER BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | 07.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOBI, Ralf Dresdener Strasse 21 D-65439 Flörsheim / DE | 02 /
WAGNER, Wilfried Neckarstrasse 7 D-35625 Hüttenberg / DE | 03 /
FALLER, Jürgen Lindenweg 11 D-63796 Kahl / DE | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 98946276.7 | 04.08.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998EP04856 | Priority number, date | DE1997134290 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19734290 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907590 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999963 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999963 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/567 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B62D25/081 (EP,US);
B60T13/5675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/20] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES BREMSKRAFTVERSTÄRKERS | [2000/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A POWER BRAKE | [2000/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN FREIN ASSISTE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.05.2002 | [2003/17] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3203495 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]US4567728 (OHMI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line L; figure 2 *; | [DA]DE3803958 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0371831 (BENDIX FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 21; figure 1 * |