EP1018277 - CALL FORWARDING IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALIN, Hannu-Pekka Vapaalantie 33 B FIN-01650 Vantaa / FI | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Fl 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Floor 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/20] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/28] | Savela, Antti-Jussi, et al Patent Agency Compatent Ltd. Pitkänsillanranta 3 B 00530 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98946485.4 | 24.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998FI00758 | Priority number, date | FI19970003805 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: FI 973805 | [2000/28] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9917565 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1018277 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018277 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | AL | 22.02.2000 | LT | 22.02.2000 | LV | 22.02.2000 | MK | 22.02.2000 | RO | 22.02.2000 | SI | 22.02.2000 | Title | German: | ANRUFWEITERLEITUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2000/28] | English: | CALL FORWARDING IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/28] | French: | RENVOI AUTOMATIQUE DES APPELS DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1998 | Translation filed | 22.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 22.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | BE | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | ES | 26.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9428670 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO9727713 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) | [A] - COMMUNICATION '92, COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY SERVICES AND SYSTEMS, (Sydney), 20-22 October 1992, G.A. FINDLOW et al., "Modeling ISDN Supplementary Services Using Coloured Petri Nets", pages 37-41. |